SHEPPEY LOCAL HISTORY SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Society maintains the historic gatehouse to Minster Abbey and provides a museum of local interest as well as monthly talks and activities relating to local History of the Isle of Sheppey.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

13 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Other Charitable Activities
- Kent
Governance
- 13 March 2015: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Teresa Duey | Trustee | 21 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Marion Cunningham | Trustee | 26 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Joanna Bascombe | Trustee | 15 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Roger Betts | Trustee | 15 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Benjamin James Pointing | Trustee | 15 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mary Thomsett | Trustee | 15 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
ANTHONY DAVID POINTING | Trustee | 25 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
MARTIN HAWKINS | Trustee | 26 April 2017 |
|
|||||
Rosemary Hawkins | Trustee | 26 April 2017 |
|
|||||
David Brown | Trustee | 26 April 2017 |
|
|||||
YVONNE SQUIRE | Trustee | 26 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
LENA CROWDER | Trustee | 13 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
JILL DIANE STIMSON | Trustee | 13 March 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.17k | £21.81k | £20.88k | £4.64k | £4.25k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.32k | £3.86k | £4.49k | £9.44k | £11.72k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £5.10k | £21.20k | £13.60k | £100 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 22 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 11 February 2025 | 11 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 01 August 2024 | 183 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 01 August 2024 | 183 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 03 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 03 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 19 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 19 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 23 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 23 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 13 Mar 2015
Charitable objects
THE FOLLOWING OBJECTS ARE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT:- 1)THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION BY THE ESTABLISHMENT AND MAINTENANCE OF A HERITAGE CENTRE AND LIBRARY FOR THE RECORDING OF LOCAL HISTORY IN RELATION TO THE ISLE OF SHEPPEY; AND 2) THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF THE GRADE I LISTED GATEHOUSE AT MINSTER ON SEA.
Area of benefit
ISLE OF SHEPPEY
Contact information
- Address:
-
5 St. Marys Row
Scrapsgate Road
Minster On Sea
SHEERNESS
Kent
ME12 2BL
- Phone:
- 07709924896
- Email:
- TONYPOINTING55@HOTMAIL.COM
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window