Financial history SEASONS REHABILITATION CENTRE LIMITED

Charity number: 1160053
Charity reporting is up to date (13 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2020 31/01/2021 31/01/2022 31/01/2023 31/01/2024
Total gross income £566.05k £866.30k £914.69k £930.05k £1.18m
Total expenditure £503.64k £797.37k £912.85k £929.26k £1.15m
Income from government contracts N/A £430.00k £430.00k £180.00k £172.86k
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £566.05k £866.30k £914.69k £930.05k £1.18m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £1 £4
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £486.87k £716.28k £834.17k £879.93k £1.14m
Expenditure - Raising funds £16.77k £81.09k £76.69k £49.33k £9.62k
Expenditure - Governance £5.15k £5.14k £4.78k £5.27k £14.97k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £1.99k £0 £0