ADHD CONNECTIONS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We hold monthly support group meeting for parents and carers. During school holidays we arrange activities for the children to get together. We offer parenting courses specifically about ADHD
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2021
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bridgend
- Caerphilly
- Cardiff
- City Of Swansea
- Neath Port Talbot
- Rhondda Cynon Taff
- Vale Of Glamorgan
Governance
- 06 May 2015: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ZOE DANIELLE PIPER | Chair | 12 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
LEANNE MARIE LLEWELLYN | Trustee | 12 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
CRAIG LEE PIPER | Trustee | 12 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
CAROLINE ANN BARWICK | Trustee | 12 December 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.62k | £2.47k | £1.34k | £300 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.34k | £2.62k | £1.30k | £300 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 117 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 117 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 483 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 483 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 848 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 848 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 21 November 2022 | 294 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1213 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 24 March 2021 | 52 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1578 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 06 May 2015
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF CHILDREN WITH ATTENTION DEFICIT HYPERACTIVITY DISORDER (ADHD), THEIR FAMILIES AND THOSE CARING FOR AND SUPPORTING THEM IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE FOLLOWING CHARITABLE MEANS AND THROUGH THE FOLLOWING ACTIVITIES: 1. RAISING AWARENESS OF ADHD AND HOW IT AFFECTS CHILDREN IN THEIR DAY TO DAY LIVES; 2. PROVIDING HELP AND SUPPORT AND BY OFFERING ADVICE TO CHILDREN WITH ADHD AND THEIR FAMILIES WHO LIVE IN BRIDGEND COUNTY BOROUGH AND NEIGHBOURING COUNTIES; 3. CAMPAIGNING FOR BETTER SERVICES FOR CHILDREN SEEKING DIAGNOSIS AND LIVING WITH A DIAGNOSIS OF ADHD, IN BRIDGEND COUNTY BOROUGH AND NEIGHBOURING COUNTIES, PROVIDED THAT THE TRUSTEES ARE SATISFIED THAT THE PROPOSED CAMPAIGNING ACTIVITIES WILL FURTHER THE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES OF THE CHARITY TO AN EXTENT JUSTIFIED BY THE RESOURCES COMMITTED AND THE ACTIVITY IS NOT THE DOMINANT MEANS BY WHICH THE CHARITY CARRIES OUT ITS OBJECTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
44 Maerdy Park
Pencoed
Bridgend
CF35 5HX
- Phone:
- 07432499164
- Email:
- adhdconnections@hotmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window