Financial history THE ARTS SOCIETY BUDLEIGH SALTERTON

Charity Number: 1160995
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £12.74k £3.26k £15.04k £9.43k £10.44k
Total expenditure £11.19k £5.12k £6.60k £12.21k £10.85k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A