THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST BUDEAUX PLYMOUTH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We have continued to serve the ecclesiastical parish of St Budeaux by providing worship services and discipleship activities, debt counselling and practical help to those in need, activities for all ages, community events and space for community activities, and by actively supporting our local church of England primary school.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

15 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Plymouth City
Governance
- 13 May 2015: Previously excepted registration
- ST BUDEAUX PARISH CHURCH (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID MANNERS | Chair | 07 April 2019 |
|
|||||
Joanna Bound | Trustee | 20 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
LOUIS NEALE | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|||||
Simon Reynolds | Trustee | 26 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Susie Bickford | Trustee | 26 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
David Belringer | Trustee | 26 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Peter Sparkes | Trustee | 26 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
ALISON WALFORD | Trustee | 07 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
JANE ELLEN TREVAINS | Trustee | 07 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
LINDA MARY CREWS | Trustee | 07 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
AUBREY TREVAINS | Trustee | 07 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
ELIZABETH PRICE | Trustee | 07 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
LINDA IRENE BATES | Trustee | 07 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
JACKIE KNAPPMAN | Trustee | 07 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
JOAN CLEMENTS | Trustee | 07 April 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £143.87k | £139.15k | £168.52k | £126.34k | £193.07k | |
|
Total expenditure | £140.38k | £139.15k | £168.52k | £133.03k | £161.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £250 | £3.08k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 23 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 23 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 29 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 29 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 24 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 24 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 25 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 25 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 26 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 26 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES THAT CAME INTO FORCE ON 02 JAN 1957
Charitable objects
PROMOTING IN THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH THE WHOLE MISSION OF THE CHURCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
St Budeaux Parish Church
The Green
Crownhill Road
Plymouth
Devon
PL5 2HN
- Phone:
- 01752361019
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window