Financial history SHEERNESS DOCKYARD PRESERVATION TRUST

Charity number: 1160812
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £270.89k £441.61k £1.53m £2.26m £561.36k
Total expenditure £237.07k £387.17k £1.95m £2.54m £1.31m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A £1.53m £2.26m £541.94k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A £0 £0 £19.42k
Income - Other N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A £1.93m £2.53m £1.30m
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A £12.43k £12.56k £9.45k
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A £0 £0 £2.50k