RED ROBIN TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Red Robin Trust aim to;Raise overall awareness & profile of Maffucci Syndrome & Ollier?s Disease,Generate income,Encourage support for fundraising activities,Help enhance knowledge,accurate diagnosis & recognition of conditions,Provide updated information,Encourage greater worldwide sharing of knowledge.Overriding objective to raise sufficient income for treatment/prevention/cure.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 September 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 27 January 2015: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CHARLOTTE ANWYLL | Chair | 16 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Heywood | Trustee | 05 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
SARAH Heal | Trustee | 16 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
MATHEW ANWYLL | Trustee | 14 May 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/09/2019 | 01/09/2020 | 01/09/2021 | 01/09/2022 | 01/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.17k | £1.43k | £321 | £193 | £120 | |
|
Total expenditure | £117 | £974 | £11 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 September 2023 | 30 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 September 2022 | 25 July 2023 | 24 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 September 2021 | 11 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 September 2020 | 21 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 September 2019 | 17 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 September 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 16 MAY 2014
Charitable objects
OUR GOVERNING DOCUMENT IS THE TEMPLATE FROM THE CHARITY COMMISSION WHICH WE HAVE ADAPTED TO RED ROBIN TRUST. THE OBJECTS OF THE TRUST (?THE OBJECTS) ARE THE RELIEF OF PERSONS WHO ARE AFFECTED BY MAFFUCCI SYNDROME AND OLLIERS DISEASE AND ANY ASSOCIATED CONDITIONS BY SEEKING TO ENSURE THAT SUCH PERSONS AND THEIR FAMILIES AND CARERS RECEIVE SUCH HELP AND ASSISTANCE AS IS CALCULATED TO RELIEVE THEIR NEED AND TO COMMISSION, UNDERTAKE, PROMOTE, AID AND SUPPORT RESEARCH INTO ALL ASPECTS OF MAFFUCCI SYNDROME AND OLLIERS DISEASE AND ANY ASSOCIATED CONDITIONS AND CAUSES TO WORK TOWARDS THEIR PREVENTION AND CURE AND TO PUBLISH AND DISSEMINATE THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC.
Contact information
- Address:
-
87 Dunbar Way
ASHBY-DE-LA-ZOUCH
LE65 1AT
- Phone:
- 07890144464
- Email:
- Admin@redrobintrust.org
- Website:
-
Www.redrobintrust.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window