Accounts and annual returns CORNWALL BUTTERFLY AND MOTH SOCIETY

Charity number: 1160409
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2024 14 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2024 14 April 2025 On Time
Annual return 31 October 2023 27 April 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2023 27 April 2024 On Time
Annual return 31 October 2022 05 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2022 05 December 2022 On Time
Annual return 31 October 2021 08 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2021 08 June 2022 On Time
Annual return 31 October 2020 07 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 07 December 2020 On Time