THE LEAGUE OF FRIENDS OF THE ROYAL GWENT HOSPITAL
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our main source of income is from running a buffet bar in the main out patients' department at Royal Gwent Hospital. selling sandwiches, confectionary, coffee, tea and soft drinks. Opening hours 9 a.m. - 4 p.m. Monday to Friday.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2021
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Newport City
Governance
- 27 July 1976: Standard registration
- 17 September 2024: Removed (Does not operate)
- 17 September 2024: Funds transferred to 1098728 ANEURIN BEVAN UNIVERSITY LOCAL HEALTH BOARD CHARIT...
- LEAGUE OF FRIENDS ROYAL GWENT HOSPITAL (Working name)
- ROYAL GWENT HOSPITAL LEAGUE OF FRIENDS (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £45.52k | £40.55k | £41.07k | £9.74k | £353 | |
|
Total expenditure | £23.61k | £25.55k | £82.76k | £10.41k | £704 | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 26 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 27 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUED ADOPTED 2 DECEMBER 1971
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE PATIENTS AND FORMER PATIENTS OF THE ROYAL GWENT HOSPITAL WHO ARE SICK, CONVALESCENT, DISABLED, HANDICAPPED, INFIRM, OR IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE AND GENERALLY, TO SUPPORT THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE SAID HOSPITAL. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 3A - M OF CONSTITUTION).
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE NEWPORT AND DISTRICT
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window