THE DIAMOND JUBILEE TOWN HALL, KIRTON IN LINDSEY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity exists to provide the Town Hall for all the people of Kirton in Lindsey, with no exceptions, facilities for leisure and recreation in the interests of social welfare and with the object of improving the conditions of life of those inhabitants.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

12 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- North Lincolnshire
Governance
- 11 March 2015: CIO registration
- THE DIAMOND JUBILEE TOWN HALL (Working name)
- THE DIAMOND JUBILEE TOWN HALL, KIRTON LINDSEY (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARY ELIZABETH HOLLINGSWORTH | Chair | 21 July 2015 |
|
|
||||||
John William Bruce McKenzie | Trustee | 15 October 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Catherine Mary Grey | Trustee | 15 October 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Vivienne Porter | Trustee | 16 April 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Kathleen Cooper | Trustee | 15 November 2022 |
|
|
||||||
HAZEL DAWN FOX | Trustee | 19 November 2019 |
|
|
||||||
BRENDA MARY TYZACK | Trustee | 21 July 2018 |
|
|
||||||
Stuart Chandler | Trustee | 17 July 2018 |
|
|||||||
PAT FRANKISH | Trustee | 21 July 2015 |
|
|||||||
CLAIRE RUTH STARTIN | Trustee | 21 July 2015 |
|
|||||||
PAM CLARK | Trustee | 21 July 2015 |
|
|
||||||
JENNIFER ANNE CRIPPS | Trustee | 21 July 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £67.93k | £60.15k | £74.16k | £69.98k | £80.54k | |
|
Total expenditure | £53.61k | £43.99k | £64.88k | £78.72k | £77.91k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £12.40k | £27.99k | £900 | £3.26k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 10 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 10 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 10 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 10 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 19 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 19 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 15 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 15 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 01 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 01 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION REGISTERED 11 MAR 2015 AMENDED ON 04/05/2015 REGISTERED ON 29/05/2015 AMENDED ON 15 MAR 2016
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE TO PROVIDE AND MAINTAIN A VILLAGE HALL AND TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF KIRTON LINDSAY("AREA OF BENEFIT") WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, AGE, DISABILITY, NATIONALITY, RACE OR POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Diamond Jubilee Town Hall
High Street
Kirton Lindsey
GAINSBOROUGH
Lincolnshire
DN21 4LZ
- Phone:
- 01652640911
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window