Financial history THE EUREKA CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity Number: 1163448
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £2.39m £7.23m £7.49m £615.08k £788.14k
Total expenditure £3.76m £1.16m £4.61m £3.31m £2.58m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £2.39m £7.22m £7.48m £590.26k £767.71k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.54k £5.90k £136 £5.93k £9.83k
Income - Other £0 £0 £12.04k £18.89k £10.60k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £3.76m £1.16m £4.61m £3.31m £2.58m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £11.97k £10.77k £6.82k £39.73k £12.57k
Expenditure - Grants institution £3.75m £1.15m £0 £3.27m £2.57m
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0