Accounts and annual returns MUSIC FOR OPEN EARS
Charity number: 1159880

Charity reporting is overdue by 1674 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 213 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 213 days | |
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 579 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 579 days | |
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 944 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 944 days | |
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1309 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1309 days | |
Annual return | 30 November 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1674 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1674 days |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window