THE POLISH SATURDAY SCHOOL IN MANCHESTER

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We support the Polish Saturday School in Manchester by providing teaching resources to further the educational and cultural program leading to national qualifications at GCSE, AS and A level in the Polish language. We hire suitable premises, and employ both paid and volunteer staff in teaching or support capacities, and ensure the health and safety of all students attending the school.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

13 Trustee(s)
31 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Services
- Bolton
- Bury
- Manchester City
- Oldham
- Rochdale
- Salford City
- Stockport
- Tameside
- Trafford
- Wigan
Governance
- 11 March 2015: CIO registration
- POLSKA SZKOLA PRZEDMIOTOW OJCZYSTYCH IM. SW. STANISLAWA KOSTKI W MANCHESTERZE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JAN PETER GRZYWINSKI BA | Chair | 11 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
Joanna Paulina Pike | Trustee | 16 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
SEBASTIAN MARIUSZ KOCON | Trustee | 26 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Edward Wilczynski | Trustee | 31 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
AGNIESZKA PREDKA | Trustee | 29 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Szymon Andrzej Zielinski | Trustee | 24 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
IRENEUSZ LUKASZ WEGRZYN | Trustee | 11 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
JUSTYNA BIELEC | Trustee | 05 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
TOMASZ KASINSKI | Trustee | 11 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
DR ANDRZEJ ANTONI ROZYCKI PHD | Trustee | 11 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
AGNIESZKA BARBARA RUTKOWSKA MED | Trustee | 11 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
BOGDAN MARIAN TRYBUCHOWSKI | Trustee | 11 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
DANUTA ANNA ANTONIK BED HONS | Trustee | 11 March 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £82.37k | £85.95k | £34.50k | £114.99k | £143.04k | |
|
Total expenditure | £82.98k | £83.60k | £82.56k | £86.13k | £124.02k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £1.43k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 20 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 20 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 14 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 14 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 25 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 25 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 14 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 14 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 01 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 01 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 11 Mar 2015
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY THE PROVISION OF A SCHOOL TO BE CALLED THE POLISH SATURDAY SCHOOL IN MANCHESTER (“THE SCHOOL”) AT WHICH SUBJECTS INCLUDING POLISH LANGUAGE, LITERATURE, HISTORY, GEOGRAPHY, ROMAN CATHOLIC RELIGION AND THE CULTURE AND HERITAGE OF POLAND ARE TAUGHT. THE TRUSTEES MAY DECIDE TO OFFER CLASSES IN ENGLISH LANGUAGE FOR THE PARENTS, CARERS OR GUARDIANS OF PUPILS ATTENDING THE SCHOOL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
7 Great Riding
Norton
RUNCORN
Cheshire
WA7 6SL
- Phone:
- 07507687850
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window