Financial history CUTTY SARK 2SAIL FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1163446
Charity reporting is overdue by 190 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022
Total gross income £250 £51 £50 £51 £50
Total expenditure £2.77k £429 £617 £292 £335
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A