Financial history BLESSING IN DISGUISE

Charity number: 1161139
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £152.69k £105.96k £61.48k £75.95k £77.83k
Total expenditure £77.03k £83.81k £93.83k £82.35k £87.33k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £24.98k N/A N/A N/A