BLESSING IN DISGUISE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
PROVISION OF SPECIALIST EQUIPMENT AND ACTIVITIES TO RELIEVE CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE LIVING IN THE UK WHO ARE DISABLED, HAVE SPECIAL NEEDS OR TERMINALLY ILL, AND THEIR PARENTS OR CARERS, ENABLING THEM TO ACHIEVE THEIR POTENTIAL, INCREASE INDEPENDENCE AND IMPROVE QUALITY OF LIFE BY THE PROVISION OF RESPITE, RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES OTHER SERVICES OR SUPPORT TO ADDRESS THEIR NEED
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 31 March 2015: Standard registration
- BLESSINGS IN DISGUISE (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JAMES ELLIS | Trustee | 31 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER TAYLOR | Trustee | 31 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
COLETTE SCOFIELD | Trustee | 13 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
CATHERINE HOLT | Trustee | 07 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
SHARON SARGENT | Trustee | 07 November 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £152.69k | £105.96k | £61.48k | £75.95k | £77.83k | |
|
Total expenditure | £77.03k | £83.81k | £93.83k | £82.35k | £87.33k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £24.98k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 05 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 05 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 05 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 05 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 02 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 02 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 03 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 03 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 03 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 03 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 26 NOV 2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 10/02/2015
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ("OBJECTS") ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE FOLLOWING:- TO RELIEVE CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE LIVING IN THE UK WHO ARE DISABLED, HAVE SPECIAL NEEDS OR ARE TERMINALLY ILL, AND THEIR PARENTS AND CARERS, BY THE PROVISION OF RESPITE, RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES AND OTHER SERVICES OR SUPPORT TO ADDRESS THEIR NEED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Lilford House
St. Helens Road
Leigh
Greater Manchester
WN7 4HG
- Phone:
- 01942 316113
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window