MSTART (MEDICAL AND SPORTING TECHNOLOGY RESEARCH TRUST)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promotion of health & saving lives by sponsorship of research & development in medical technology. Advancement of life and relief of needs of young people & the advancement of their education particularly in science & technology in order to develop their skills, capacities & capabilities to allow them to participate in society as mature & responsible individuals. To promote amateur sport
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 19 January 2015: CIO registration
- MSTART (Working name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
HENRY GEORGE CROFT | Trustee | 05 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER MARK MORRIS | Trustee | 05 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW RICHARD DELVE | Trustee | 19 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
MELVYN MORRIS | Trustee | 19 January 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £148.95k | £196.39k | £148.05k | £11.33k | £171.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £192.41k | £192.41k | £392.46k | £474.59k | £308.01k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 14 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 14 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 22 May 2024 | 112 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 22 May 2024 | 112 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 June 2022 | 140 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 20 June 2022 | 140 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 20 June 2022 | 505 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 20 June 2022 | 505 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 19 Jan 2015
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES (ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND & WALES) AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT FROM TIME TO TIME IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT LIMITED TO: • THE PROMOTION OF HEALTH & SAVING OF LIVES BY SPONSORSHIP OF RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT IN MEDICAL TECHNOLOGY; • THE ADVANCEMENT IN LIFE AND RELIEF OF NEEDS OF YOUNG PEOPLE AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF THEIR EDUCATION PARTICULARLY IN SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY IN ORDER TO DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS; AND TO RELIEVE THEIR UNEMPLOYMENT; AND • THE PROMOTION OF AMATEUR SPORT FOR THE PURPOSES OF HEALTHY RECREATION.
Contact information
- Address:
-
3 New Park Place
Pride Park
Derby
DE24 8DZ
- Phone:
- 02920238239
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window