HOPE FOR TOMORROW GLOBAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We support initiatives which alleviate poverty and bring dignity to the poor and vulnerable and which empower people to bring about change and transformation in their own communities and nations. We are teaching people to feed their families by training them in Foundations for Farming and are also enabling hundreds of children to attend school by providing uniforms and school kits.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Burundi
- Rwanda
Governance
- 05 October 2015: CIO registration
- HFTG (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lois Taylor | Trustee | 19 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
NIGEL RING | Trustee | 16 March 2018 |
|
|||||
DONNA BLOOMFIELD | Trustee | 05 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
JEREMY GRAEME THORNTON | Trustee | 05 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
Valerie Morgan | Trustee | 05 October 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £90.62k | £104.29k | £167.41k | £197.14k | £261.44k | |
|
Total expenditure | £88.59k | £81.69k | £190.68k | £137.47k | £272.83k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 21 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 21 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 18 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 18 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 05 Oct 2015
Charitable objects
IN ACCORDANCE WITH CHRISTIAN PRINCIPLES AS SET OUT IN THE STATEMENT OF FAITH, THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT: 1) THE RELIEF AND/OR PREVENTION OF POVERTY IN SUCH PLACES AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE; 2) THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL NEED AND SUFFERING AMONG VICTIMS OF NATURAL OR OTHER KINDS OF DISASTER; 3) THE ADVANCEMENT OF HEALTH AND SAVING OF LIVES IN SUCH PLACES AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE; AND 4) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN SUCH WAYS AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
HFTG C/O Gateway Church
TRINITY CENTRE
STONEHILL GREEN
WESTLEA
SWINDON
SN5 7AR
- Phone:
- 07470524892
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window