Trustees PENNINE ANIMAL WELFARE SOCIETY

Charity number: 1159544
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Michele Anne Way Chair 21 July 2018
None on record
Stewart Thomas Trustee 13 April 2025
None on record
Katherine Frances Roberts Trustee 08 March 2025
None on record
Jennifer Kay Farrell Trustee 04 May 2023
None on record
Lorraine Thomas Trustee 20 March 2020
None on record
KIRSTY BAIRD BVMS MRCV Trustee 14 October 2014
None on record