Financial history THE NEW BAGTHORPE RECREATION GROUND AND COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity number: 505407
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2014 31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018
Total gross income £7.84k £10.74k £12.12k £12.04k £13.29k
Total expenditure £9.95k £13.74k £22.66k £19.41k £16.27k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 £0 £0 N/A