THE CONGREGATION OF THE SISTERS OF CHARITY OF SAINT LOUIS CIO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity is involved in education, the relief of poverty, faith education, the allocation of grants to further research into education and the care and support of its older Sisters.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Surrey
- Throughout London
- France
- Madagascar
Governance
- 13 March 2015: CIO registration
- 25 May 2016: Funds received from 227929 CONGREGATION OF THE SISTERS OF CHARITY OF ST LOUIS
- THE CONGREGATION OF THE SISTERS OF SAINT LOUIS CIO (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Henri Carvalho | Trustee | 23 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
GAEL HICKS | Trustee | 30 September 2019 |
|
|||||
Andrew Cole | Trustee | 01 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
Brian Taylor | Trustee | 01 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
SISTER MARY ELIZABETH GRIMES | Trustee | 13 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
SISTER JOSEPHINE PATRICIA GOGGIN | Trustee | 13 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
SISTER JEANNE DANION | Trustee | 13 March 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £174.08k | £158.99k | £2.45m | £194.83k | £194.61k | |
|
Total expenditure | £198.77k | £190.61k | £204.63k | £149.17k | £2.08m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | £66.57k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | £105.39k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | £2.28m | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £204.63k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | £1.77k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | £138.96k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 02 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 02 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 27 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 17 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 17 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 13 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 13 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 11 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 11 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 13 Mar 2015 as amended on 14 Feb 2022 as amended on 05 Nov 2024
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE ROMAN CATHOLIC RELIGION THROUGH THE RELIGIOUS AND OTHER CHARITABLE WORK OF THE CONGREGATION AS THE TRUSTEES WITH THE APPROVAL OF THE PROVINCIAL SUPERIOR SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Sisters of Charity of St. Louis
218 Sheen Road
Richmond
TW10 5AN
- Phone:
- 02088763300
- Email:
- jogoggin2@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window