Financial history IVEGILL NURSERY

Charity number: 1159380
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £50.50k £58.92k £56.17k £42.31k £57.08k
Total expenditure £47.53k £49.38k £52.22k £54.65k £56.96k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £40.25k £48.42k £47.65k £29.69k £49.21k