Financial history ROCHDALE HORNETS SPORTING FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1159601
Charity reporting is up to date (88 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £54.38k £82.38k £43.38k £124.13k £98.93k
Total expenditure £66.38k £54.78k £64.98k £120.06k £95.43k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £6.18k £31.73k £4.00k £80.95k