LIONS MMA (WOLVES)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Sikh ethos martial arts club
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2021
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Services
- Wolverhampton
Governance
- 03 December 2014: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SUBEG SINGH DHILLON | Chair | 03 December 2014 |
|
|
||||
SATVINDER SINGH BILLEN | Trustee | 03 December 2015 |
|
|
||||
PAVANDEEP SINGH SHAKHAM | Trustee | 03 December 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.52k | £350 | £2.35k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.80k | £0 | £1.89k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 204 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 204 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 570 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 570 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 10 September 2024 | 680 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 10 September 2024 | 680 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 10 September 2024 | 1045 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 10 September 2024 | 1045 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 15 November 2021 | 380 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1665 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 03 Dec 2014
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR MARTIAL ARTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
42H POND LANE
WOLVERHAMPTON
WV2 1HG
- Phone:
- 07967205496
- Email:
- lionsmmawolves@hotmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window