Financial history GIVE FOR GOOD

Charity number: 1160883
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £194.26k £181.08k £160.25k £144.07k £111.22k
Total expenditure £188.56k £160.18k £179.28k £151.23k £123.01k
Income from government contracts N/A £91.06k N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £7.79k N/A N/A