RED CYPHER

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Fostering esprit de corps, comradeship, morale and the welfare of the Regiment and preserving its traditions. Maintaining comradeship and contact between past and present members of the Regiment, fostering mutual friendship and providing social gatherings for them. To relieve, generally or individually members of the Regiment and dependants, who are in conditions of need, hardship or distress.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

12 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Armed Forces/emergency Service Efficiency
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 20 April 2015: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Col Retd. Andrew David Budd MSM | Chair | 11 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Major Fran Sykes MBE RHA | Trustee | 25 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
RSM Jonathan Colvan-Graham | Trustee | 18 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Capt Steven Sinclair RHA | Trustee | 11 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Maj Patrick Armstrong RHA | Trustee | 08 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Major Simon Howe | Trustee | 06 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michael Webb | Trustee | 13 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Will Grace | Trustee | 27 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Thorpe | Trustee | 12 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
David Howells JP | Trustee | 24 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
YEOMAN WARDER ANDREW SHEDDEN | Trustee | 20 April 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £68.88k | £66.46k | £76.54k | £74.31k | £75.93k | |
|
Total expenditure | £66.53k | £72.37k | £85.07k | £72.16k | £67.36k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 14 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 14 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 09 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 09 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 05 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 05 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 08 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 08 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 30 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 20 Apr 2015 as amended on 03 Sep 2019 as amended on 23 Mar 2021 as amended on 28 Jun 2021
Charitable objects
A. THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE: (1) TO PROMOTE THE EFFICIENCY OF 3 RHA, AMONGST OTHER THINGS, BY: (A) FOSTERING ESPRIT DE CORPS, COMRADESHIP, MORALE AND THE WELFARE OF THE REGIMENT AND PRESERVING ITS TRADITIONS. (B) MAINTAINING COMRADESHIP AND CONTACT BETWEEN PAST AND PRESENT MEMBERS OF THE REGIMENT, FOSTERING MUTUAL FRIENDSHIP BETWEEN THEM AND PROVIDING SOCIAL GATHERINGS FOR THEM. (2) TO RELIEVE, EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY, PAST AND PRESENT MEMBERS OF THE REGIMENT AND THEIR DEPENDANTS, WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS. B. THE BOARD MAY RELIEVE PERSONS IN NEED UNDER CLAUSE 3.A. (2) ABOVE BY: (1) MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY, OR (2) PROVIDING OR PAYING FOR GOODS, SERVICES OR FACILITIES FOR THEM, OR (3) MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY TO OTHER PERSONS OR BODIES WHO PROVIDE GOODS, SERVICES OR FACILITIES TO THOSE IN NEED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
RHQ
3rd Regiment Royal Horse Artillery
Albemarle Barracks
Ouston
NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE
NE15 0RF
- Phone:
- 00000000000
- Email:
- enquiry@redcypher.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window