Trustees SYRESHAM VILLAGE HALL
Charity Number: 1160674

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CHRISTINA ROSEMARY LINDEN MUNSEY | Chair | 25 February 2015 |
|
|
||||
Gary Mitchell | Trustee | 17 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Stephanie Mitchell | Trustee | 17 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Adam Jeskins | Trustee | 28 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
David Green | Trustee | 08 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Michael Maund | Trustee | 12 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Ian Draper | Trustee | 13 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
KEITH WATTS | Trustee | 26 February 2015 |
|
|
||||
DOROTHY DUNKLEY | Trustee | 26 February 2015 |
|
|
||||
ANN ELIZABETH IRWIN | Trustee | 26 February 2015 |
|
|
||||
KATHLEEN BRUNNING | Trustee | 26 February 2015 |
|
|
||||
GILLIAN SWINFORD | Trustee | 26 February 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.