UPSTREAM CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity Number: 1160627
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Grant maker

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £8,113

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Other Finance
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 25 February 2015: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Risk management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

2 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Paul Gilmour Chair 18 February 2015
THE ALFRED HAINES CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
WIDE HORIZONS
Received: On time
SCOUT ASSOCIATION COUNTY OF BIRMINGHAM
Received: On time
THE SECOND QUOTHQUAN CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: 8 days late
Philippa Gilmour Trustee 18 February 2015
HARVEST FIELDS CENTRE LTD
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £70.53k £17 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £9.11k £8.03k £14.76k £10.61k £8.11k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 01 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 22 September 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 27 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 28 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 30 August 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 30 August 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
dale farm
Worcester Lane
B75 5PR
Phone:
01213233236
Email:
No information available
Website:

upstreamcharitabletrust.org.uk