Tawheed Islamic Education Centre of Maidenhead

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide a centre for Islamic education and worship
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

14 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Windsor And Maidenhead
Governance
- 13 February 2015: CIO registration
- 12 February 2016: Funds received from 1121867 MARKAZI JAMIAT AHL-E-HADITH MAIDENHEAD
- AL-TAWHEED ISLAMIC EDUCATION CENTRE (Working name)
- MARKAZI JAMIAT AHL-E-HADITH MAIDENHEAD CIO (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr ASIF ALI | Chair | 10 November 2014 |
|
|||||
MOHAMMED SALIM | Trustee | 10 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
MOHAMMED HANIF | Trustee | 10 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
ZULFIKAR ALI | Trustee | 10 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
ALI AKHTAR | Trustee | 10 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
JAWEED AKHTAR | Trustee | 10 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
ASHRAQ NAZIR | Trustee | 10 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
SAJID ALI | Trustee | 10 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
ASHFAQ MAHMUD | Trustee | 10 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
MOHAMMED RASHID | Trustee | 10 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
MOHAMMED RAZAQ | Trustee | 10 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
MOHAMMED IRFAN RAFIQ | Trustee | 10 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
YASEEN MOHAMMED HUSSAIN | Trustee | 10 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
TARIQ MAHMOOD MAJEED | Trustee | 10 November 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £469.52k | £442.52k | £128.35k | £117.66k | £155.02k | |
|
Total expenditure | £37.12k | £29.94k | £40.27k | £70.43k | £87.08k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 13 Feb 2015 as amended on 31 Jan 2022
Charitable objects
FOR PUBLIC BENEFIT TO ADVANCE THE ISLAMIC FAITH, INCLUDING BUT NO LIMITED TO EDUCATION IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE TEACHINGS OF THE QURAN AND HADITH AND BY ESTABLISHING AN AHL-E-HADITH CENTRE TO FACILITATE LEARNING AS WELL AS A PLACE OF WORSHIP AND ISLAMIC EDUCATION FOR CHILDREN, MEN AND WOMEN.
Contact information
- Address:
-
22 COOKHAM ROAD
MAIDENHEAD
SL6 8AJ
- Phone:
- 07718705090
- Email:
- Info.tiecm@gmail.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window