PHILADELPHIA COVENANT KEEPERS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
WE HOLD CHURCH SERVICES IN STOCKWELL/CENTRAL LONDON, THE CENTRE OF A VIBRANT COMMUNITY OF DIFFERENT RACES AND CULTURES. WE CONTINUE TO MAKE KNOWN THE LOVE OF GOD TO OUR NEIGHBOURS WITH LOVE AND RESPECT, THROUGH THE PREACHING OF THE GOSPEL; AS PHILADELPHIA MEANS ?BROTHERLY LOVE. WE ENJOY BEING A DIVERSE COMMUNITY ALL SHARING IN A COMMON GOAL OF MAKING JESUS CHRIST KNOWN IN OUR COMMUNITY.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Lambeth
Governance
- 13 February 2015: CIO registration
- PHILADELPHIA CITY CHURCH (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
NOAH MUSHET | Chair | 10 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
Joel Murhabazi Chikwanine | Trustee | 24 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
LUTI LISUMBU | Trustee | 11 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
GOODNESS KYUPA MWAPE CHANTAL MUSHET | Trustee | 10 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
DIEUDONNE MUNUNGA NDONGO | Trustee | 01 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL MOBOLAJI OLUWASEUN OGUNTUASE | Trustee | 01 January 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.42k | £3.38k | £3.84k | £4.90k | £4.95k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.37k | £3.18k | £3.62k | £4.62k | £5.36k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 15 September 2024 | 15 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 15 September 2024 | 15 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 31 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 01 September 2023 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 31 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 31 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 27 September 2021 | 27 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 27 September 2021 | 27 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 07 September 2020 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | 07 September 2020 | 7 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 13 Feb 2015
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 31
Wealdstone Court
32 Brook Avenue
Wembley
HA9 8PQ
- Phone:
- 07412050022
- Email:
- noah_mushet@yahoo.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window