Financial history THE LEEDS MALE VOICE CHOIR

Charity Number: 1159299
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £14.76k £13.81k £18.17k £13.74k £24.39k
Total expenditure £8.78k £15.65k £13.81k £12.27k £37.63k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £685