FAHMAZ TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Prevention, or relief of poverty, enhancement of youth education (including under privileged youths), welfare , medical assistance to disaster victims . Also provide financial support to centres caring for orphanages, widows and OAP.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Other Charitable Activities
- Birmingham City
- City Of London
- Harrow
- Hillingdon
- Bangladesh
- India
- Kenya
- Philippines
- Tanzania
Governance
- 13 March 2015: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
HASSANAIN M G DAYA | Chair | 08 December 2014 |
|
|
||||
Nuru Mohammed | Trustee | 03 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
MUHAMMAD HASSANAIN GULAMHUSEIN DAYA | Trustee | 08 December 2014 |
|
|
||||
ANAAR HASSANAIN DAYA | Trustee | 08 December 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £26.34k | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.95k | £13.13k | £9.85k | £40.95k | £83.01k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 22 March 2022 | 50 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 08 February 2021 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 08 DEC 2014
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE TO SUPPORT SUCH EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY: 1 THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY OR FINANCIAL HARDSHIP ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION, TRAINING, HEALTHCARE PROJECTS AND ALL THE NECESSARY SUPPORT DESIGNED TO ENABLE INDIVIDUALS TO GENERATE A SUSTAINABLE INCOME AND BE SELF-SUFFICIENT; AND/OR 2 THE RELIEF OF NEED IN INDIVIDUALS ARISING FROM THEIR YOUTH, AGE, GENDER, INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES; AND/OR 3 THE TREATMENT AND CARE OF PERSONS SUFFERING FROM MENTAL OR PHYSICAL ILLNESS OF ANY DESCRIPTION OR IN NEED OF REHABILITATION AS A RESULT OF SUCH ILLNESS; AND/OR 4 THE RELIEF OF NEED AND SUFFERING AMONG VICTIMS OF NATURAL OR OTHER KINDS OF DISASTER; BY ANY CHARITABLE MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY THE PROVISION OF GRANTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
UNIT 3 & 4 CHANCERYGATE BUSINESS CENTRE
CHANCERYGATE WAY
OFF STONEFIELD WAY
SOUTH RUISLIP
MIDDLESEX
HA4 0JA
- Phone:
- 02088392222
- Email:
- hdaya@fahmaz.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window