THE INSURANCE INDUSTRY CHARITABLE FOUNDATION - LONDON DIVISION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
IICF improves the lives of vulnerable and disadvantaged people by uniting the insurance industry in grant giving, volunteering and leadership.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£100k to £110k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 08 October 2015: Standard registration
- IICF - LONDON DIVISION (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Julian LaVille | Trustee | 17 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Chris Lockwood | Trustee | 05 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mark Trumper | Trustee | 08 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dawn Miller | Trustee | 19 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
STUART BARTRAM | Trustee | 19 June 2019 |
|
|||||
Kieran Jones | Trustee | 06 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
WILLIAM ROSS | Trustee | 01 June 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £299.28k | £228.39k | £303.28k | £245.19k | £296.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £356.38k | £248.15k | £259.42k | £262.19k | £314.64k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 14 November 2024 | 14 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 14 November 2024 | 14 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 03 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 03 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 13 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 13 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 05 November 2021 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 08 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 10 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 14 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 01 JUN 2015 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 02 JUN 2016 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 08 DEC 2016 as amended on 06 Jun 2024
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY IS ESTABLISHED FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AS ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE, BY THE PROVISION OF GRANTS TO REGISTERED CHARITIES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
1ST FORMATIONS LTD
71-75 SHELTON STREET
LONDON
WC2H 9JQ
- Phone:
- +1 424 253-1107
- Email:
- WWILDER@IICF.COM
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window