DEVELOP BHUTAN

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Develop Bhutan a UK registered organisation working in partnership with local organisation in Bhutan on projects related to education, health, livelihood development, cultural and environmental preservation. We connect philanthropist and funders with projects in Bhutan. Find more details at www.developbhutan.org
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 January 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout London
- Bhutan
- India
- Nepal
Governance
- 23 July 2015: CIO registration
- DEVELOP BHUTAN (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Neil Hope | Chair | 01 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Graham Dampier Irons | Trustee | 01 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dawa Dem | Trustee | 04 April 2015 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/01/2020 | 30/01/2021 | 30/01/2022 | 30/01/2023 | 30/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £689 | £0 | £200 | £9.10k | £320 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.04k | £895 | £0 | £9.14k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 January 2024 | 20 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 January 2024 | 20 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 January 2023 | 18 April 2024 | 140 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 January 2023 | 18 April 2024 | 140 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 January 2022 | 05 December 2022 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 January 2022 | 05 December 2022 | 5 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 January 2021 | 04 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 January 2021 | 04 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 January 2020 | 10 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 January 2020 | 10 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 23 Jul 2015
Charitable objects
THE FOLLOWING OBJECT ARE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT:- 1) THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY IN BHUTAN BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION, TRAINING, HEALTHCARE PROJECTS AND ALL THE NECESSARY SUPPORT DESIGNED TO ENABLE INDIVIDUALS TO GENERATE A SUSTAINABLE INCOME AND BE SELF-SUFFICIENT; AND 2) TO PROMOTE BHUTANESE ART, CULTURE AND HERITAGE IN LONDON THROUGH THE ESTABLISHMENT AND MAINTENANCE OF A CULTURAL CENTRE TO SHOWCASE BHUATANESE CULTURE AND TRADITIONS.
Area of benefit
IN BHUTAN
Contact information
- Address:
-
81 WALDEGRAVE PARK
81 WALDEGRAVE PARK
LONDON
81 Waldegrave Park
TWICKENHAM
TW1 4TJ
- Phone:
- 07716311802
- Email:
- dawa@developbhutan.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window