THE BRIERLEY HILL AND DISTRICT COMMITTEE FOR THE WELFARE OF THE BLIND
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Welfare of the Blind fundraising
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2014
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Dudley
Governance
- 23 August 1976: Standard registration
- 29 June 2015: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2010 | 31/07/2011 | 31/07/2012 | 31/07/2013 | 31/07/2014 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.68k | £2.99k | £421 | £552 | £67.69k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.72k | £6.83k | £11.33k | £8.88k | £9.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2014 | 27 February 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2014 | 14 April 2015 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 July 2013 | 07 March 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2013 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2012 | 12 April 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2012 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2011 | 03 July 2012 | 33 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2011 | 21 May 2012 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 13 JANUARY 1960
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE AND PROVIDE WELFARE FACILITIES IN THE DISTRICT OF BRIERLEY HILL AND AMBLECOTE FOR THE WELFARE OF BLIND PERSONS, AND BY ASSISTING THE WORK OF STATUTORY AUTHORITIES AND VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS ENGAGED IN PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR PHYSICAL AND MENTAL RECREATION, DEVELOPING PHYSICAL IMPROVEMENT, FURTHERING HEALTH, RELIEVING POVERTY, DISTRESS OR SICKNESS, OR IN PURSOVERTY, DISTRESS OR SICKNESS, OR IN PURSUING ANY OBJECTS WHICH AR NOW OR HEREAFTER MAY BE DEEMED BY LAW TO BE CHARITABLE. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSES 2, 3, 4 AND 5 OF THE CONSTITUTION).
Area of benefit
DISTRICTS OF BRIERLEY HILL AND AMBLECOTE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window