READING BLUE COAT AND ARCHBISHOP LAUD CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The provision of a day and/or boarding school in or near Reading. The award of scholarships, bursaries or maintenance allowances.The provision of items, services and facilities at three specified Schools in Reading.The provision of financial assistance to young men and women from Reading, Wokingham or Bray to support them in training for a trade or vocation or entering into marriage.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Reading
- Windsor And Maidenhead
- Wokingham
Governance
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PETER MICHAEL BERTRAM | Chair | 15 May 2025 |
|
|
||||||||
Rev Christopher Richard Jones | Trustee | 15 May 2024 |
|
|||||||||
MATTHEW WALKER | Trustee | 09 November 2022 |
|
|||||||||
Peter Thomas | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|||||||||
Howard Williams | Trustee | 15 May 2018 |
|
|||||||||
Michael Swan | Trustee | 16 May 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £233.51k | £207.66k | £209.41k | £183.35k | £191.90k | |
|
Total expenditure | £172.04k | £158.49k | £187.78k | £173.51k | £176.38k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 03 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 03 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 22 February 2023 | 22 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 22 February 2023 | 22 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 19 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 19 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 14 Jan 2015 as amended on 12 Nov 2020 as amended on 14 May 2024
Charitable objects
3.1 The CIO shall comprise an amalgamation of two unincorporated charities - the Reading Blue Coat School Foundation (charity number 309024) and the Archbishop Laud Non Educational Charity (charity number 307987). Accordingly, the objects of the CIO set out below shall be a reflection of the objects of these two unincorporated charities, with separate funds being set aside for the furtherance of the respective objects. 3.2 The first object of the CIO, reflecting the object of the Reading Blue Coat School Foundation, is to advance the education of children and young people under the age of 25 years by: 3.2.1 the provision of a day and/or boarding school in or near Reading in which religious instruction in accordance with the doctrines of the Church of England shall be given; 3.2.2 the award of scholarships, bursaries or maintenance allowances to beneficiaries tenable at the School or at any university or other place of learning; provided that the charity trustees shall maintain in the School six scholarships, comprising total or partial remission of tuition or boarding fees, to beneficiaries found fit for admission to the School who reside within a ten mile radius of the School; 3.2.3 the provision of grants, outfits, clothing, tools, instruments or books to help beneficiaries on leaving the School, a university or any other educational establishment, to prepare for, or enter, a profession, trade or calling; 3.2.4 the award of scholarships or maintenance allowances to enable beneficiaries to travel abroad to pursue their education; 3.2.5 the provision, or assistance towards the provision, of facilities for recreation and social and physical training, including the provision of coaching in athletics, sports and games, for beneficiaries; 3.2.6 the provision of grants to enable beneficiaries to study music or other arts; and 3.2.7 the provision of grants, items, services and facilities at the following schools in Reading: (a) All Saints Church of England Infants School, Brownlow Road; (b) St John’s Church of England Primary School; (c) St Mary’s and All Saints Church of England Primary School; and (d) Any other school within a forty mile radius of the School at the CIO’s discretion 3.3 The second object of the CIO, reflecting the object of the Archbishop Laud Non Educational Charity, is the provision of financial assistance to young men and women between the age of 8 to 30 years inclusive, educated in, residing in or from the vicinity of Reading, to support them in training for a trade or vocation through the making of grants as follows: 3.3.1 Young men and women between the age of 16 – 30 inclusive may be awarded training grants of up to £1000 per individual, per annum, towards the cost course fees, equipment, learning resources, travel expenses or uniform required for the course, where the trustees are satisfied that the applicant has entered into a course of training and has need of financial assistance. Applicants undertaking a multi-year course are eligible for up to three grants; and 3.3.2 Girls and boys between the age of 8 – 15 inclusive may be awarded training grants of up to £300 per individual, per annum, towards the cost of course fees, equipment, learning resources, travel expenses or uniform required for the course, where the trustees are satisfied that the applicant is in education and has need of financial assistance. 3.4 Subject to Clause 5 below, the freehold land known as Reading Blue Coat School, Holme Park, Sonning Lane, Sonning, Reading, Berkshire, RG4 6SU, registered under Land Registry title number BK371516 and the buildings thereon (vested in the Official Custodian for Charities by an Order of 8 June 1996) (“the Property”), must be retained by the charity trustees for use as a school in accordance with Clause 3.2.1 above.
Contact information
- Address:
-
READING BLUE COAT SCHOOL
HOLME PARK
SONNING LANE
SONNING
READING
RG4 6SU
- Phone:
- 01189335808
- Email:
- bursar@rbcs.org.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window