THE TUEBROOK COMMUNITY CENTRE GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity offers a range of sporting and leisure activities. It seeks to help & provide facilities for young people, elderly, people with disabilities and socially disadvantaged.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £11,300 from 6 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Liverpool City
Governance
- 27 August 1976: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JIMMY CAMPBELL | Trustee | 10 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Chris Gorman | Trustee | 01 August 2016 |
|
|
||||
Pauline Gorman | Trustee | 01 August 2016 |
|
|
||||
Ann McConnell | Trustee | 01 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
Tommy McConnell | Trustee | 15 April 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £18.84k | £21.59k | £27.02k | £11.73k | £19.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £20.99k | £16.02k | £28.09k | £13.07k | £19.53k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.50k | £19.43k | £10.66k | £8.66k | £11.30k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 18 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 21 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 02 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 02 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 29 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 12 JULY 1976
Charitable objects
(A) TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE TUEBROOK AREA OF LIVERPOOL AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD (HEREINAFTER CALLED "THE AREA OF BENEFIT") WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND INHABITANTS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS. (B) TO ESTABLISH OR TO SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE.
Area of benefit
TUEBROOK AREA
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 MARLBOROUGH ROAD
TUEBROOK
LIVERPOOL
L13 8AU
- Phone:
- 07938490105
- Email:
- jamescampbellabc@hotmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window