MENTAL HEALTH NORTHANTS COLLABORATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide a diverse range of services for adults experiencing or recovering from mental or emotional distress, their families, carers and friends. We support people who have had long-term experience of accessing mental health/well-well being services. Our activities include 1-1 support, Intermediate Support, Peer Support, Day Opportunities, Education and Learning Courses and Groups.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £1,445,071 from 4 government grant(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Northamptonshire
Governance
- 16 March 2015: Standard registration
- MHNC (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mark Mitchell | Trustee | 05 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Rachael Lewis PhD | Trustee | 22 April 2022 |
|
|||||
Sarah Louise Hillier | Trustee | 20 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Emma Marie Smith | Trustee | 20 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Rachael Caroline Lewis | Trustee | 20 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Samuel Evetts | Trustee | 23 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Steven Behan | Trustee | 25 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sue Pepper | Trustee | 19 February 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2019 | 30/11/2020 | 30/11/2021 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £206.92k | £577.00k | £1.32m | £1.82m | £1.45m | |
|
Total expenditure | £194.00k | £462.84k | £613.55k | £1.43m | £1.93m | |
|
Income from government contracts | £195.02k | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £577.00k | N/A | £1.82m | £1.45m | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | £577.00k | £1.32m | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | £0 | £0 | £1.50k | £2.01k | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | £462.84k | £613.55k | £1.42m | £1.92m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | £0 | £0 | £7.53k | £12.78k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | £2.94k | £18.38k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | £459.90k | £595.17k | £0 | £1.88m | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 30/11/2019 | 30/11/2020 | 30/11/2021 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Long-term investments | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | N/A | £129.14k | £835.14k | £1.23m | £741.99k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | N/A | £450 | £3.00k | £3.30k | £3.46k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 21 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 18 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 06 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 20 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 09 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | 16 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 21 October 2021 | 21 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | 21 October 2021 | 21 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2019 | 19 October 2020 | 19 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2019 | 19 October 2020 | 19 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 04 NOV 2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 03/02/2015 as amended on 19 Sep 2018 as amended on 19 May 2021
Charitable objects
3.2 THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ('THE OBJECTS') ARE: 3.2 THE CHARITY’S OBJECTS (“OBJECTS”) ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE FOLLOWING: 3.2.1 TO PROMOTE THE EFFECTIVE USE OF RESOURCES BY CHARITABLE AND NON- CHARITABLE BODIES OPERATING IN THE LOCAL GOVERNMENT AREA OF NORTHAMPTONSHIRE FOR THE CHARITABLE PURPOSE OF THE ADVANCEMENT OF GOOD MENTAL HEALTH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT; 3.2.2 TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC, INCLUDING USERS OF MENTAL HEALTH SERVICES AND MENTAL HEALTH PRACTITIONERS, IN ALL AREAS RELATING TO MENTAL HEALTH; 3.2.3 TO ADVANCE GOOD MENTAL HEALTH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN PARTICULAR BY: 3.2.3.1 RAISING AWARENESS OF MENTAL HEALTH ISSUES AFFECTING INDIVIDUALS; 3.2.3.2 GIVING PEOPLE INVOLVED WITH MENTAL HEALTH SERVICES OR USERS OF SUCH SERVICES A VOICE AND AN OPPORTUNITY TO INFLUENCE THE PLANNING, DEVELOPMENT, DELIVERY AND MONITORING OF MENTAL HEALTH SERVICE IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT; AND 3.2.3.3 PROMOTING THE BENEFITS OF GOOD MENTAL HEALTH GENERALLY AMONGST MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC
Contact information
- Address:
-
C/O TEAMWORK TRUST
1 STANIER CLOSE
KETTERING
NORTHAMPTONSHIRE
NN16 9XW
- Phone:
- 07734231631
- Email:
- jim.lyon@mhnc.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window