Trustees MENTAL HEALTH NORTHANTS COLLABORATION
Charity number: 1160931

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mark Mitchell | Trustee | 05 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Rachael Lewis PhD | Trustee | 22 April 2022 |
|
|||||
Sarah Louise Hillier | Trustee | 20 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Emma Marie Smith | Trustee | 20 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Rachael Caroline Lewis | Trustee | 20 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Samuel Evetts | Trustee | 23 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Steven Behan | Trustee | 25 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sue Pepper | Trustee | 19 February 2020 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.