HARPENDEN CRICKET CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
HARPENDEN CRICKET CLUB IS A CRICKET CLUB WITH THE OBJECTIVES OF PROVIDING COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION BY PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR PLAYING OF CRICKET AND OTHER SPORTS AND TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE. THE CLUB IS CURRENTLY SOLELY FOCUSED ON CRICKET AND WE CURRENTLY HAVE 9 SENIOR SIDES AND AROUND 300 COLTS PLAYING IN 16 JUNIOR TEAMS.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 26 February 2015: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SIMON DOUGLAS WADE | Chair | 09 December 2014 |
|
|
||||||
David Mark Washington | Trustee | 29 November 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Simon Andrew Caunce | Trustee | 20 November 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Geoff Newman | Trustee | 09 December 2014 |
|
|||||||
PHIL WATERS | Trustee | 09 December 2014 |
|
|
||||||
MARK ERIC FORDHAM | Trustee | 09 December 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £113.02k | £129.16k | £161.61k | £176.67k | £160.53k | |
|
Total expenditure | £108.23k | £104.02k | £151.67k | £192.56k | £189.57k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k | £22.24k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 13 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | 13 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 20 October 2024 | 82 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 20 October 2024 | 82 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 28 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 28 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 27 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 27 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 12 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 12 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 14 OCT 2014
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CLUB ARE TO: -PROVIDE COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION BY PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR PLAYING CRICKET AND OTHER SPORTS ("FACILITIES" MEANS LAND, BUILDINGS, EQUIPMENT AND ORGANISATION OF CRICKETING OR OTHER SPORTING ACTIVITIES); - ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE WHETHER OR NOT UNDERGOING FORMAL EDUCATION
Contact information
- Address:
-
49 Southdown Road
HARPENDEN
Hertfordshire
AL5 1PQ
- Phone:
- 01582715777
- Email:
- chairman@harpendencc.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window