Financial history BARDNEY GATEWAY CENTRE

Charity number: 1160878
Charity reporting is up to date (62 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £10.35k £22.54k £8.72k £7.87k £16.54k
Total expenditure £12.31k £6.69k £10.64k £10.44k £12.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £12.53k N/A £1.45k N/A