THE DON MILLER CHARITABLE TRUST CIO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF HIGH BEECH AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THE RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- City Of London
- Essex
- Hertfordshire
- Waltham Forest
Governance
- 10 July 2015: CIO registration
- 04 September 2017: Funds received from 1103433 THE DON MILLER CHARITABLE TRUST
- THE GARDENS OF HANBURY (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Janet Evelyn Farrar | Trustee | 23 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Katie Godfrey | Trustee | 23 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Bill Pondman | Trustee | 23 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Vasilis Nicolouzos | Trustee | 23 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
John Pretty | Trustee | 23 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Cretten | Trustee | 23 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Simon Christopher Lordan | Trustee | 23 January 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £39.96k | £39.66k | £144.57k | £73.45k | £89.69k | |
|
Total expenditure | £123.12k | £107.75k | £190.23k | £123.91k | £66.66k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 01 November 2024 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 01 November 2024 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 09 April 2024 | 161 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 09 April 2024 | 161 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 20 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 20 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 04 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 04 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 15 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 December 2019
(These accounts |
15 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 10 Jul 2015
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF HIGH BEECH AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THE RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITION OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE COTTAGE
ADJACENT TO THE GARDENS OF HANBURY
PYNEST GREEN LANE
WALTHAM ABBEY
ESSEX
EN9 3QL
- Phone:
- 02085085111
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window