Financial history THE CLAY FOUNDATION

Charity Number: 1160430
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £624.25k £439.94k £574.70k £392.34k £720.99k
Total expenditure £616.90k £343.88k £608.08k £401.17k £710.78k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £101.01k N/A
Income from government grants £139.40k £140.78k £25.00k £25.00k £125.57k
Income - Donations and legacies £125 N/A £1.17k N/A £22.81k
Income - Other trading activities £0 N/A £0 N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities £624.13k N/A £507.00k N/A £655.52k
Income - Endowments £0 N/A £0 N/A £0
Income - Investment £0 N/A £0 N/A £0
Income - Other £0 N/A £66.53k N/A £42.66k
Income - Legacies £0 N/A £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £616.90k N/A £608.08k N/A £710.78k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 N/A £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Governance £2.56k N/A £4.24k N/A £3.53k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 N/A £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Other £0 N/A £0 N/A £0