THE TAM O'SHANTER COTTAGE URBAN FARM TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Manage a city farm on the outskirts of Birkenhead, Wirral for public recreation and education. With a small collection of farm animals, cafe, nature trail, special events and gift shop the farm also provides opportunities for volunteers to be involved from maual tasks to fundraising.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
45 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Wirral
Governance
- 31 August 1976: Standard registration
- TAM O'SHANTER URBAN FARM (Working name)
- THE TAM O'SHANTER COTTAGE TRUST (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Tom Sault | Chair | 17 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Kathryn Maria Pennington | Trustee | 01 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Standring | Trustee | 13 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Pauline Elizabeth Hayes | Trustee | 13 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Shaun Brady | Trustee | 26 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Josephine Mary Wood MBE | Trustee | 06 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Wood | Trustee | 15 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
George Davies | Trustee |
|
||||||
STEVE FOULKES | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 04/04/2020 | 04/04/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £102.29k | £136.39k | £135.09k | £105.84k | £135.07k | |
|
Total expenditure | £122.99k | £118.14k | £104.05k | £136.85k | £152.12k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £105.23k | £56.19k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 04 April 2021 | 04 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2021 | 04 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 04 April 2020 | 04 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2020 | 04 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 15 JUNE 1976 AS AFFECTED BY SCHEME OF 8 SEPTEMBER 1989 AND SCHEME OF 22 DECEMBER 1997. ALSO MINUTES OF TRUSTEES MEETING DATED 4 MARCH 1998 & 1 DECEMBER 2004
Charitable objects
1. TO PROMOTE THE PRESERVATION OF THE BUILDING ERECTED ON THE LAND SPECIFIED IN THE SCHEDULE HERETO AND KNOWN AS THE TAM O'SHANTER COTTAGE FOR USE AS A FIELD STUDY CENTRE FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN THE BOROUGH OF WIRRAL; AND 2. TO PROVIDE AND MAINTAIN FACILITIES IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AN D LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE SAID BOROUGH WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE
Area of benefit
BOROUGH OF WIRRAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
15 Morpeth Close
Moreton
WIRRAL
CH46 6HQ
- Phone:
- 07775903462
- Email:
- hello@tamoshanterfarm.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window