Financial history THE BENITH CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1159700
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022 31/05/2023 31/05/2024
Total gross income £8.75k £10.17k £10.18k £12.73k £12.66k
Total expenditure £50.21k £69.60k £58.64k £66.37k £77.82k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A