WESSEX 4X4 RESPONSE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Assisting the emergency services and local communities in the Wessex region (Wiltshire, Dorset, Avon and Somerset) by providing logistical support. Volunteer drivers donate their time and vehicles to assist in times of need. We provide critical transport when contingency plans fail - such as the transport of nurses through snow to get to patients. We are able to transport people or equipment.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
220 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Dorset
- Somerset
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 05 January 2015: CIO registration
- 13 April 2021: Funds received from 1114087 WESSEX 4X4 RESPONSE ASSOCIATION
- W4X4R (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Matthew Chaloner | Chair | 20 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mark John Browne | Trustee | 05 April 2025 |
|
|||||
Francis Raven-Vause | Trustee | 05 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Mellisa Pudney | Trustee | 05 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Costin | Trustee | 05 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Divall | Trustee | 05 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
James Kerwin Welch | Trustee | 20 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Melita Jeffries | Trustee | 20 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Norman Phillip Dagger | Trustee | 01 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Peter Wells | Trustee | 15 April 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/01/2020 | 01/01/2021 | 01/01/2022 | 01/01/2023 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £42.81k | £11.35k | £5.41k | £20.69k | £24.85k | |
|
Total expenditure | £24.69k | £4.48k | £14.05k | £26.39k | £18.10k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 18 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 January 2023 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2023 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 January 2022 | 26 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2022 | 26 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 January 2021 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2021 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 January 2020 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2020 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 05 Jan 2015 as amended on 05 Apr 2025
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT HUMAN LIFE, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY SUPPLEMENTING AND SUPPORTING EMERGENCY SERVICES IN WILTSHIRE, DORSET, AVON AND SOMERSET AND THE ADJACENT COUNTIES IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY PROVIDING EQUIPMENT AND VEHICLES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
3 Velley Hill
Gastard
CORSHAM
Wiltshire
SN13 9PU
- Phone:
- 00
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window