Financial history LEUVA PATIDAR SAMAJ (SURAT, NAVSARI & VALSAD DISTRICT) OF LEICESTER

Charity number: 1164745
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £26.32k £2.69k £2.28k £22.44k £35.67k
Total expenditure £30.84k £2.24k £7.36k £27.72k £31.05k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £300 N/A N/A £288 N/A