Trustees DESIGN IN MENTAL HEALTH LIMITED
Charity number: 1162561

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MR P ROSS | Chair | 08 August 2013 |
|
|||||
Alexander Mathieson | Trustee | 20 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Lianne Clare Knotts | Trustee | 01 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Beatrice Lesser Fraenkel | Trustee | 01 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Steven Brown | Trustee | 04 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Katharine Lazenby | Trustee | 04 November 2020 |
|
|||||
Professor Paula Reavey | Trustee | 04 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Anne Lake | Trustee | 20 November 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.