Accounts and annual returns STING (STAFFORDSHIRE THERAPEUTIC INDEPENDENT NEUROLOGICAL GROUP)

Charity number: 1161045
Regulatory alert
Charity reporting is overdue by 1559 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 98 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 98 days
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 464 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 464 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 829 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 829 days
Annual return 31 March 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1194 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 31 December 2024 1065 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1559 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 31 December 2024 1430 days late Download Open in new window