STING (STAFFORDSHIRE THERAPEUTIC INDEPENDENT NEUROLOGICAL GROUP)


Charity overview
Regulatory alerts
-
Notice of dissolution on application of the CIO (see details)
The Commission intends to dissolve this CIO after three months from the date of this notice unless cause is shown to the contrary. Representations must be made to the Commission within three months. Email your representation to CIOnotices@charitycommission.gov.uk
Quote the charity number and head the email 'CIO dissolution representation'.
Notice dated: 24 April 2025
Activities - how the charity spends its money
STING is a user-led group based in Stone, Staffs. STING aims to provide help and support to people affected by a neurological condition in the first instance but is also open to anyone affected by a life-limiting condition. We offer various exercise sessions, Physiotherapy, social and fundraising events and are open to anyone living in Staffordshire and the surrounding areas.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2021
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Staffordshire
Governance
- 24 March 2015: CIO registration
- STING (Previous name)
- STING (STAFFORDSHIRE THERAPUTIC INDEPENDENT NEUROGICAL GROUP) (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MR M CLAYTON | Chair | 01 July 2014 |
|
|
||||
Karen Ellis Mrs | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
MR L PAXTON | Trustee | 01 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Professor ANTHONY BARRINGTON WARD Professor | Trustee | 10 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Clayton Miss | Trustee | 01 July 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2017 | 30/04/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £38.35k | £57.14k | £40.14k | £11.21k | £14.01k | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.55k | £27.27k | £19.74k | £18.90k | £8.36k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £500 | £500 | £500 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 95 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 95 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 461 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 461 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 826 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 826 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1191 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 31 December 2024 | 1065 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1556 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 December 2024 | 1430 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 24 Mar 2015
Charitable objects
TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT THE GOOD HEALTH OF PEOPLE AFFECTED BY NEUROLOGICAL CONDITIONS BY:- A)PROVIDING THEM WITH SUPPORT AND ADVICE TO ENABLE THEM TO MAKE INFORMED CHOICES; B)OFFERING A RANGE OF APPROPRIATE ACTIVITIES; C)PROVIDING A PRACTICAL AND EMOTIONAL PEER SUPPORT; D)PROVIDING SUPPORT AND ADVICE TO CARERS; E)WORKING WITH GROUPS WITH SIMILAR AIMS IN ORDER TO EXCHANGE APPROPRIATE INFORMATION.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE BEECHES
206 Seabridge Lane
NEWCASTLE
ST5 3LS
- Phone:
- 07976972778
- Email:
- MIKE@MAKECONNEXIONS.CO.UK
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window